THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:39:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: Esdaile, Ashley Christine (Used Until: 20 May 2020)
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301 - 10 Unionville Gate
Markham East FHO
Markham ON L3R 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 475-3121
Extension: 21
Fax: (905) 475-4270

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Oct 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Esdaile Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Esdaile Minzatu (CPSO#: 108013 )
Business Address: 8054 Yonge Street
Vaughan Ontario L4J 1W3
(905) 886-1212
Business Address: 10 Unionville Gate
Suite 301
Markham ON L3R 0W7

General Information

Former Name: Esdaile, Ashley Christine (Used Until: 20 May 2020)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301 - 10 Unionville Gate
Markham East FHO
Markham ON L3R 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 475-3121
Extension: 21
Fax: (905) 475-4270

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Oct 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Wisconsin

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Esdaile Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jul 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Esdaile Minzatu (CPSO#: 108013 )
Business Address: 8054 Yonge Street
Vaughan Ontario L4J 1W3
(905) 886-1212
Business Address: 10 Unionville Gate
Suite 301
Markham ON L3R 0W7

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Nov 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 14 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ashley Christine Esdaile may practise medicine independently in family
medicine and pain medicine.




VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Ashley Christine Esdaile may practise medicine independently in family
medicine and pain medicine.




Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Nov 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 02 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Feb 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Feb 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2015