THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:33:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAY, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Heart Institute
2464 Howard Avenue, Suite 201
Windsor
Ontario
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 977-6643
Fax: (519) 915-6326

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dhssraj Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Feb 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAY, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Heart Institute
2464 Howard Avenue, Suite 201
Windsor
Ontario
Windsor Ontario N8X 3V6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 977-6643
Fax: (519) 915-6326

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Oct 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dhssraj Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Feb 2023

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Apr 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 07 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Dhssraj Singh may practise medicine independently in cardiology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Dhssraj Singh may practise medicine independently in cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2015