THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:18:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Cambridge St N
Ottawa ON K1R 7A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-6262
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 299 Montreal Rd
Vanier ON K1L 6B8
Phone: 6137485999
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. LIVINGSTONE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Livingstone (CPSO#: 108018 )
Business Address: 299 Montreal Rd
Vanier ON K1L 6B8
613-748-5999

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 60 Cambridge St N
Ottawa ON K1R 7A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-562-6262
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 299 Montreal Rd
Vanier ON K1L 6B8
Phone: 6137485999
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Jun 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 25 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. LIVINGSTONE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Livingstone (CPSO#: 108018 )
Business Address: 299 Montreal Rd
Vanier ON K1L 6B8
613-748-5999

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON MARTIN LIVINGSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIVINGSTONE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AARON MARTIN LIVINGSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIVINGSTONE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2015