THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/04/25 07:45:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1995
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1005 Farnham Road
London Ontario N6K 1S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-914-3384
Fax: 519-472-2809
Address: 14987 Yonge Street
Multicare Specialty Pharmacy
Aurora Ontario L4G 1M5
Phone: (905) 503-6100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1005 Farnham Road
London Ontario N6K 1S3
Phone: 5199142809
Fax: 5194722809
Address: 1400 Western Road
London Ontario N6G 2V4
Phone: 519-931-5731
Fax: 519-931-5737

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Oct 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Azarpazhooh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Azarpazhooh (CPSO#: 108025 )
Business Address: L H S C
University Hospital
Department of Neurological Sciences
339 Windmere Road, Room C7-002
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(613) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1005 Farnham Road
London Ontario N6K 1S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-914-3384
Fax: 519-472-2809
Address: 14987 Yonge Street
Multicare Specialty Pharmacy
Aurora Ontario L4G 1M5
Phone: (905) 503-6100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1005 Farnham Road
London Ontario N6K 1S3
Phone: 5199142809
Fax: 5194722809
Address: 1400 Western Road
London Ontario N6G 2V4
Phone: 519-931-5731
Fax: 519-931-5737

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 01 Oct 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Azarpazhooh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Azarpazhooh (CPSO#: 108025 )
Business Address: L H S C
University Hospital
Department of Neurological Sciences
339 Windmere Road, Room C7-002
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(613) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Nov 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 09 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MAHMOUD REZA AZARPAZHOOH may practise medicine independently in Neurology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MAHMOUD REZA AZARPAZHOOH may practise medicine independently in Neurology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1995

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Nov 2023
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 26 Apr 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2015