THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:25:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ROMANIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 160 Av Stillview
Lakeshore General Hospital
Emergency Department
Pointe-Claire QC H9R 2Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (514) 630-2225
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeshore General Hospital
160 Stillview Avenue
Pointe-Claire Quebec H9R 2Y2
Phone: (514) 630-2225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tudor Botnaru Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Botnaru (CPSO#: 108028 )
Business Address: Emergency Department
Room S.1.184
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: Emergency Department
160 Stillview Avenue
Pointe-Claire Quebec H9R 2Y2
(514) 630-2225

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ROMANIAN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 160 Av Stillview
Lakeshore General Hospital
Emergency Department
Pointe-Claire QC H9R 2Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (514) 630-2225
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Lakeshore General Hospital
160 Stillview Avenue
Pointe-Claire Quebec H9R 2Y2
Phone: (514) 630-2225
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tudor Botnaru Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Botnaru (CPSO#: 108028 )
Business Address: Emergency Department
Room S.1.184
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: Emergency Department
160 Stillview Avenue
Pointe-Claire Quebec H9R 2Y2
(514) 630-2225

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TUDOR CRISTIAN BOTNARU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTNARU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TUDOR CRISTIAN BOTNARU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTNARU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2015