THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:44:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 465 Grand Ave W
Chatham Ontario N7L 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-351-6464
Fax: 519-351-4890

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cara L McMahon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. McMahon (CPSO#: 108043 )
Business Address: 465 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 1C5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 465 Grand Ave W
Chatham Ontario N7L 1C5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-351-6464
Fax: 519-351-4890

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cara L McMahon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. C. McMahon (CPSO#: 108043 )
Business Address: 465 Grand Ave W
Chatham ON N7L 1C5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARA LYNNE MCMAHON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMAHON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARA LYNNE MCMAHON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCMAHON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2015