THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:43:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9080 Yonge st. Unit#5
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-597-2528
Fax: 905-597-2536
Address: 2 Allaura Blvd; Unit 11
Aurora Ontario L4G 3S5
Phone: 905-713-1717
Fax: 905-751-0506

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Jianfar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jianfar (CPSO#: 108051 )
Business Address: 11-2 Allaura Boulevard
Aurora Ontario L4G 3S5
(905) 713-1717
Business Address: Unit 5
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
(905) 597-2528

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9080 Yonge st. Unit#5
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-597-2528
Fax: 905-597-2536
Address: 2 Allaura Blvd; Unit 11
Aurora Ontario L4G 3S5
Phone: 905-713-1717
Fax: 905-751-0506

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Jianfar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jianfar (CPSO#: 108051 )
Business Address: 11-2 Allaura Boulevard
Aurora Ontario L4G 3S5
(905) 713-1717
Business Address: Unit 5
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
(905) 597-2528

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JINOOS JIANFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIANFAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JINOOS JIANFAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIANFAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2015