THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 05:05:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, PUSHTO, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 217 Terrace Hill Street
unit 200
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193045455
Fax: 5193045255

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghias U. D. Butt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Butt (CPSO#: 108064 )
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 1A7
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: B20 - 217 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G8
(519) 304-6433
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: 12 - 1401 Plains Road East
Burlington Ontario L7R 0C2
(905) 333-9477

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, PUSHTO, URDU
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 217 Terrace Hill Street
unit 200
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193045455
Fax: 5193045255

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 05 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 05 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghias U. D. Butt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Butt (CPSO#: 108064 )
Business Address: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington Ontario L7S 1A7
(905) 632-3737
Business Address: B20 - 217 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G8
(519) 304-6433
Business Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: 12 - 1401 Plains Road East
Burlington Ontario L7R 0C2
(905) 333-9477

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GHIAS UD DIN BUTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GHIAS UD DIN BUTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUTT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 10 May 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 10 May 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: University of Peshawar, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 25 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 2015