THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:47:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 128
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie, Ontario
L4N7L3
Barrie Ontario L4N7L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-726-0173
Fax: 705-725-9575

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Natt (CPSO#: 108065 )
Business Address: 1595 Merivale Road
Ottawa Ontario K2G 3J4
(613) 482-0118
Business Address: 128-370 Bayview Dr
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
7057260173

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 128
370 Bayview Drive
Barrie, Ontario
L4N7L3
Barrie Ontario L4N7L3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-726-0173
Fax: 705-725-9575

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Natt (CPSO#: 108065 )
Business Address: 1595 Merivale Road
Ottawa Ontario K2G 3J4
(613) 482-0118
Business Address: 128-370 Bayview Dr
Barrie ON L4N 7L3
7057260173

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DILJAAN SINGH NATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NATT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DILJAAN SINGH NATT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NATT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2015