THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:49:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, TURKISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 334 Broad Street West
Haldimand Ontario N1A 1T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-738-9503
Fax: 1-855-741-0540

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omar Ezzat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ezzat (CPSO#: 108074 )
Business Address: 334 Broad Street West
Suite 101
Dunnville Ontario N1A 1T1
289 738-9503

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC, TURKISH
Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 334 Broad Street West
Haldimand Ontario N1A 1T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-738-9503
Fax: 1-855-741-0540

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Omar Ezzat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Ezzat (CPSO#: 108074 )
Business Address: 334 Broad Street West
Suite 101
Dunnville Ontario N1A 1T1
289 738-9503

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR ERFAN EZZAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EZZAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OMAR ERFAN EZZAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EZZAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Baghdad College of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2015