THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:51:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vital Urgent Care
Unit D
11210 Creditview Road
Brampton Ontario L7A 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)-495-4500
Fax: (905)-840-0976
Address: Vital Urgent Care
2740 North Park Drive
Unit 35
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15-10 Squire Ellis Dr
Vital Urgent Care - Squire Ellis Medical Centre
Brampton ON L6P 4K6
Phone: 905-789-0010
Fax: 905-789-0011
Address: 695 Remembrance Road
Vital Urgent Care Brampton North
Unit 103
Brampton Ontario L7A 4N4
Phone: 905-846-9090
Fax: 905-846-3003

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mohan (CPSO#: 108078 )
Business Address: 11210 Creditview Road
Unit D
Brampton Ontario L7A 4X3
(905) 495-4500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Vital Urgent Care
Unit D
11210 Creditview Road
Brampton Ontario L7A 4X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905)-495-4500
Fax: (905)-840-0976
Address: Vital Urgent Care
2740 North Park Drive
Unit 35
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 15-10 Squire Ellis Dr
Vital Urgent Care - Squire Ellis Medical Centre
Brampton ON L6P 4K6
Phone: 905-789-0010
Fax: 905-789-0011
Address: 695 Remembrance Road
Vital Urgent Care Brampton North
Unit 103
Brampton Ontario L7A 4N4
Phone: 905-846-9090
Fax: 905-846-3003

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 29 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mohan (CPSO#: 108078 )
Business Address: 11210 Creditview Road
Unit D
Brampton Ontario L7A 4X3
(905) 495-4500

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Jan 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 26 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rajiv Mohan may practise medicine independently in family medicine and low risk, non-surgical cosmetic procedures.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Rajiv Mohan may practise medicine independently in family medicine and low risk, non-surgical cosmetic procedures.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Jan 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Jan 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2015