THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:03:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Hematology
610 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Hematology
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2G4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 15 Nov 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MB Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Davidson (CPSO#: 108079 )
Business Address: 4169464501 Extn: 3568

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Hematology
610 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-4501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: UHN Toronto General Hospital
Division of Hematology
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto Ontario M5G 2G4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 15 Nov 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MB Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Davidson (CPSO#: 108079 )
Business Address: 4169464501 Extn: 3568

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTA BEATA DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTA BEATA DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Sep 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Nov 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2015