THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:45:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Zimbabwe, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brantford Children Walk in Clinic
225 Fairview Drive
Suite 3
Brantford Ontario N3R 7E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)304-5460
Fax: (519)304-6460
Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: 519 7515544
Extension: 2354
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allen Samuel Arhen Mkondo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mkondo (CPSO#: 108080 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: Brantford Children Walk in Clinic
3-225 Fairview Dr
Suite 3
Brantford ON N3R 7E3
(416) 850-8947

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Zimbabwe, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brantford Children Walk in Clinic
225 Fairview Drive
Suite 3
Brantford Ontario N3R 7E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519)304-5460
Fax: (519)304-6460
Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: 519 7515544
Extension: 2354
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 16 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 16 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allen Samuel Arhen Mkondo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mkondo (CPSO#: 108080 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544
Business Address: Brantford Children Walk in Clinic
3-225 Fairview Dr
Suite 3
Brantford ON N3R 7E3
(416) 850-8947

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLEN SAMUEL ARHEN MKONDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MKONDO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLEN SAMUEL ARHEN MKONDO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MKONDO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Zimbabwe, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2015