THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:37:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106 Victoria Street West
2nd Floor
Alliston Ontario L9R1Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-435-0080
Fax: 705-435-0083
Address: 20 Lynch Street
Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Surgery
OR Suite
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: 4164743400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bikraj Singh Chohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chohan (CPSO#: 108087 )
Business Address: 106 Victoria St W
Second floor
Alliston ON L9R 1Y7
705-435-0080
Business Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
416-747-3554

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 106 Victoria Street West
2nd Floor
Alliston Ontario L9R1Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-435-0080
Fax: 705-435-0083
Address: 20 Lynch Street
Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Surgery
OR Suite
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: 4164743400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bikraj Singh Chohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Chohan (CPSO#: 108087 )
Business Address: 106 Victoria St W
Second floor
Alliston ON L9R 1Y7
705-435-0080
Business Address: 101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
416-747-3554

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BIKRAJ SINGH CHOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BIKRAJ SINGH CHOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Oct 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2015