THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:45:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Lake Erie College of Osteopathic Medicin, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057289802
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 500 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 8X3
Phone: 7055038890
Fax: 7057194878

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 14 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alyssa Fiddler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fiddler (CPSO#: 108105 )
Business Address: 101-500 Huronia Rd
Barrie ON L4N 8X3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Lake Erie College of Osteopathic Medicin, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057289802
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 500 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 8X3
Phone: 7055038890
Fax: 7057194878

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 14 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alyssa Fiddler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fiddler (CPSO#: 108105 )
Business Address: 101-500 Huronia Rd
Barrie ON L4N 8X3

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Sep 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 14 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Alyssa Brianne Fiddler may practise medicine independently in neurology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Alyssa Brianne Fiddler may practise medicine independently in neurology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Lake Erie College of Osteopathic Medicin, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Mar 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Oct 2015