THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:39:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-807 Broadview Ave
Toronto ON M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 461-9471
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 26 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr James M Regan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Regan (CPSO#: 108110 )
Business Address: PO Box 948 Stn A
Toronto ON M5W 1G5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-807 Broadview Ave
Toronto ON M4K 2P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 461-9471
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 26 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr James M Regan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Regan (CPSO#: 108110 )
Business Address: PO Box 948 Stn A
Toronto ON M5W 1G5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES M REGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES M REGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2015