THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:54:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: Lalji, Narisa (Used Until: 22 Oct 2015)
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 576 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 528 5292
Fax: 905 528 7753

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Narisa Duboff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Duboff (CPSO#: 108125 )
Business Address: 576 Main St E
Hamilton ON L8M 1J2
(905) 528-5292

General Information

Former Name: Lalji, Narisa (Used Until: 22 Oct 2015)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 576 Main Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8M 1J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 528 5292
Fax: 905 528 7753

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Narisa Duboff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Duboff (CPSO#: 108125 )
Business Address: 576 Main St E
Hamilton ON L8M 1J2
(905) 528-5292

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARISA DUBOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBOFF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NARISA DUBOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUBOFF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Oct 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2015