THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:09:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Georgian Dr
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Extension: 43333
Fax: 705-739-5619

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Oncology
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. L. Ball Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ball (CPSO#: 108132 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090 Extn: 43333

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Georgian Dr
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Extension: 43333
Fax: 705-739-5619

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Oncology
Effective: 26 Sep 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. L. Ball Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ball (CPSO#: 108132 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090 Extn: 43333

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON LAURA BALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALLISON LAURA BALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2015