THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:09:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-215 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196017171
Fax: 5196017174
Address: 110 - 525 Belmont Ave. W.
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Phone: 519 621 9257
Fax: 519 208 8182
Address: Wonderland South Medical Centre
1051 Wonderland Rd S
London Ontario N6K 3X4
Phone: (519) 472-2060
Fax: (519) 471-7299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krukowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Krukowski (CPSO#: 108135 )
Business Address: Wonderland South Medical Centre
1051 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 3X4
(519) 472-2060
Business Address: 110-525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
(519) 621-9257
Business Address: 215 Fanshawe Park Road West
Inmedic Pain Management Centre
Suite 202
London Ontario N6G 5A9
519 601 7171

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-215 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London ON N6G 5A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196017171
Fax: 5196017174
Address: 110 - 525 Belmont Ave. W.
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
Phone: 519 621 9257
Fax: 519 208 8182
Address: Wonderland South Medical Centre
1051 Wonderland Rd S
London Ontario N6K 3X4
Phone: (519) 472-2060
Fax: (519) 471-7299

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Krukowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Krukowski (CPSO#: 108135 )
Business Address: Wonderland South Medical Centre
1051 Wonderland Road South
London Ontario N6K 3X4
(519) 472-2060
Business Address: 110-525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5E2
(519) 621-9257
Business Address: 215 Fanshawe Park Road West
Inmedic Pain Management Centre
Suite 202
London Ontario N6G 5A9
519 601 7171

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD WESLEY KRUKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRUKOWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICHARD WESLEY KRUKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRUKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: College of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2015