THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:36:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Rose-Ville Garden Dr.
Unit 101
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-4771
Fax: (519) 258-4793
Address: 2525 Rose-Ville Garden Drive
Suite: 103 Unit 2
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
Phone: 519-915-7777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Jan 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thien Hoa Trang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Trang (CPSO#: 108149 )
Business Address: Suite 101
2525 Rose-Ville Garden Drive
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
(519) 258-4771

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, VIETNAMESE
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Rose-Ville Garden Dr.
Unit 101
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-4771
Fax: (519) 258-4793
Address: 2525 Rose-Ville Garden Drive
Suite: 103 Unit 2
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
Phone: 519-915-7777
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Jan 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 31 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thien Hoa Trang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Trang (CPSO#: 108149 )
Business Address: Suite 101
2525 Rose-Ville Garden Drive
Windsor Ontario N8T 3J8
(519) 258-4771

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THIEN HOA TRANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THIEN HOA TRANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 20 Sep 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 20 Sep 2017
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Apr 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2015