THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:36:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 813 Richmond St.
London Ontario N6A 3H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 270-0007
Fax: (226) 270-1021
Address: 1472 Huron Street
London Ontario N5V 2E5
Phone: 519-601-6640
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Feb 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 24 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JONATHAN KEYS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Keys (CPSO#: 108159 )
Business Address: 813 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6A 3H6

Corporation Name: Jonathan Keys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Dec 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 813 Richmond St.
London Ontario N6A 3H6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (226) 270-0007
Fax: (226) 270-1021
Address: 1472 Huron Street
London Ontario N5V 2E5
Phone: 519-601-6640
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Feb 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 24 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JONATHAN KEYS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Feb 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Keys (CPSO#: 108159 )
Business Address: 813 Richmond Street
London Ontario N6A 3H6

Corporation Name: Jonathan Keys Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Dec 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN ROBERT KEYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEYS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN ROBERT KEYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEYS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2015