THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:30:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pediatric Urgent Care
2540 Postmaster Dr
Oakville Ontario L6M 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058475437
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1601 Lakeshore Road West
2nd Floor
Mississauga Ontario L5J 1J4
Phone: 9058220742
Fax: 9058221779
Address: 8-478 Dundas St W
Oakville ON L6H 6Y3
Phone: 905-847-5437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Apr 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 02 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Phillip Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Phillip (CPSO#: 108166 )
Business Address: 2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville Ontario L6M 0N2
905-847-5437

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pediatric Urgent Care
2540 Postmaster Dr
Oakville Ontario L6M 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058475437
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1601 Lakeshore Road West
2nd Floor
Mississauga Ontario L5J 1J4
Phone: 9058220742
Fax: 9058221779
Address: 8-478 Dundas St W
Oakville ON L6H 6Y3
Phone: 905-847-5437
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 02 Apr 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 02 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Phillip Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Phillip (CPSO#: 108166 )
Business Address: 2540 Postmaster Drive
Oakville Ontario L6M 0N2
905-847-5437

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Jan 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 27 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AYESHA PHILLIP may practise medicine independently in outpatient pediatrics.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. AYESHA PHILLIP may practise medicine independently in outpatient pediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University Of Antigua, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jan 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Sep 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Feb 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Nov 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Dec 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2015