THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:18:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Aurora Parkway Medical
520 Industrial Parkway South
Aurora Ontario L4G 6W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 750-0080
Fax: (905) 750-0085

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saman Zamanian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zamanian (CPSO#: 108182 )
Business Address: 520 Industrial Parkway South
Aurora Ontario L4G 6W8
(905) 750-0080

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Aurora Parkway Medical
520 Industrial Parkway South
Aurora Ontario L4G 6W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 750-0080
Fax: (905) 750-0085

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Saman Zamanian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Zamanian (CPSO#: 108182 )
Business Address: 520 Industrial Parkway South
Aurora Ontario L4G 6W8
(905) 750-0080

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMAN ZAMANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMANIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMAN ZAMANIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAMANIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 May 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 May 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 May 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2015