THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:17:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
Radiology Department
1200 4th Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: 2893981031

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 03 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Saskatchewan
Iran
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara-on-the-Lake Hospital Site of the Niagara Health System Niagara-on-the-lake
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara-on-the-Lake Hospital Site of the Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara-on-the-lake

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Sabri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sabri (CPSO#: 108238 )
Business Address: 1200 4th Avenue
Radiology Department
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Niagara Health System
Radiology Department
1200 4th Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: 2893981031

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 03 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Saskatchewan
Iran
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Niagara-on-the-Lake Hospital Site of the Niagara Health System Niagara-on-the-lake
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara-on-the-Lake Hospital Site of the Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara-on-the-lake

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ali Sabri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sabri (CPSO#: 108238 )
Business Address: 1200 4th Avenue
Radiology Department
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI SABRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABRI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALI SABRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SABRI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2015