THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:16:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 10
17 Ray Lawson Blvd
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 497-7475
Fax: (905) 450-2535
Address: 8730 the Gore Road
Brampton Ontario L6P 0B1
Phone: (647) 557-2232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Connecticut

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sabha Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cheema (CPSO#: 108247 )
Business Address: Unit 10
17 Ray Lawson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5L8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 10
17 Ray Lawson Blvd
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 497-7475
Fax: (905) 450-2535
Address: 8730 the Gore Road
Brampton Ontario L6P 0B1
Phone: (647) 557-2232
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Oct 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Connecticut

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sabha Cheema Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cheema (CPSO#: 108247 )
Business Address: Unit 10
17 Ray Lawson Boulevard
Brampton Ontario L6Y 5L8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABHA SHOUKAT CHEEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEEMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABHA SHOUKAT CHEEMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHEEMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Nov 2015