THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:04:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300G Fourth Ave
GROW Niagara Health
Suite 101
St. Catharines ON L2S 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-984-6060
Fax: 905-984-6560
Address: St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Uthra Mohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Mohan (CPSO#: 108250 )
Business Address: 21 Front Street South
Thorold Ontario L2V 1W8
(905) 688-6460
Business Address: St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 300G Fourth Ave
GROW Niagara Health
Unit 101
St Catharines ON L2S 0E6
(905) 984 6060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 300G Fourth Ave
GROW Niagara Health
Suite 101
St. Catharines ON L2S 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-984-6060
Fax: 905-984-6560
Address: St. Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Ave
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Uthra Mohan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Mohan (CPSO#: 108250 )
Business Address: 21 Front Street South
Thorold Ontario L2V 1W8
(905) 688-6460
Business Address: St Catharines General Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
(905) 378-4647
Business Address: 300G Fourth Ave
GROW Niagara Health
Unit 101
St Catharines ON L2S 0E6
(905) 984 6060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UTHRA MOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UTHRA MOHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Dec 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2015