THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:02:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 - 3090 Colonel Talbot Rd
London Ontario N6P 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-672-2366
Fax: 519-937-9114
Address: 3030 Singleton Ave
The Village of Glendale Crossing - Long Term Care Home
London ON N6L 0B6
Phone: 519-668-5600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adriana Pietrzak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pietrzak (CPSO#: 108290 )
Business Address: 2-3090 Colonel Talbot Rd
London ON N6P 0B3
519-672-2366

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2 - 3090 Colonel Talbot Rd
London Ontario N6P 0B3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-672-2366
Fax: 519-937-9114
Address: 3030 Singleton Ave
The Village of Glendale Crossing - Long Term Care Home
London ON N6L 0B6
Phone: 519-668-5600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 21 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adriana Pietrzak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pietrzak (CPSO#: 108290 )
Business Address: 2-3090 Colonel Talbot Rd
London ON N6P 0B3
519-672-2366

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANA BEATA PIETRZAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIETRZAK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADRIANA BEATA PIETRZAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PIETRZAK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jan 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2015