THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 05:01:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TELUGU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept of Anesthesia & Perioperative
Medicine
339 Winderemere Rd
University Hospital C3-127
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 21 Mar 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 21 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deepti Vissa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vissa (CPSO#: 108307 )
Business Address: Department of Anesthesia & Perioperative Medicine
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road, C3-127
London Ontario N6A 5A5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, TELUGU
Medical School: Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept of Anesthesia & Perioperative
Medicine
339 Winderemere Rd
University Hospital C3-127
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 21 Mar 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 21 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deepti Vissa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vissa (CPSO#: 108307 )
Business Address: Department of Anesthesia & Perioperative Medicine
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road, C3-127
London Ontario N6A 5A5

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 Feb 2025
20 Mar 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 21 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Mar 20 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. DEEPTI VISSA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Department of Anesthesia & Perioperative Medicine, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. VISSA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. VISSA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. VISSA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. VISSA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 21 March, 2020, and expires on 20 March, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. VISSA's academic appointment at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. DEEPTI VISSA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Department of Anesthesia & Perioperative Medicine, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. VISSA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. VISSA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. VISSA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. VISSA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 21 March, 2020, and expires on 20 March, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. VISSA's academic appointment at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dr. N.T.R University of Health Sciences, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 20 Mar 2027
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Mar 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 20 Mar 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2016