THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Superior Urology Clinic
146 Court Street South
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 2X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 285-9292
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahrour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Shahrour (CPSO#: 108324 )

Corporation Name: Walid Shahrour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jul 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Superior Urology Clinic
146 Court Street South
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 2X6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 285-9292
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Fort Frances

HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shahrour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Shahrour (CPSO#: 108324 )

Corporation Name: Walid Shahrour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jul 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WALID SHAHROUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHROUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WALID SHAHROUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHROUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2015