THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:59:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hopital de Shawville
200 rue Argue
Shawville Quebec J0X 2Y0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (819) 647-2211
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
Phone: 613-732-2811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Cornelia St W
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
Phone: 613-283-2330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Aug 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 02 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sio Mei Lai Medicine Professional Corporation/Dr. Sio Mei Lai Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lai (CPSO#: 108333 )
Business Address: 705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
Business Address: 200 Rue Argue
Shawville Quebec J0X 2Y0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hopital de Shawville
200 rue Argue
Shawville Quebec J0X 2Y0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (819) 647-2211
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
Phone: 613-732-2811
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 60 Cornelia St W
Smiths Falls Ontario K7A 2H9
Phone: 613-283-2330
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Aug 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 02 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
HOSPITAL: Pembroke Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Pembroke

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sio Mei Lai Medicine Professional Corporation/Dr. Sio Mei Lai Medecine Societe Professionnelle
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lai (CPSO#: 108333 )
Business Address: 705 Mackay Street
Pembroke Ontario K8A 1G8
Business Address: 200 Rue Argue
Shawville Quebec J0X 2Y0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIO MEI LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIO MEI LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2015