THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 06:07:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Milan, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre for Addiction and
Mental Health
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 525 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Telepsychiatry
Toronto ON M5G 2L3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Battaglia & Marino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Battaglia (CPSO#: 108348 ) Dr. C. Marino (CPSO#: 108347 )
Business Address: 80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4

Corporation Name: Battaglia & Marino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Jun 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ITALIAN
Medical School: University of Milan, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Centre for Addiction and
Mental Health
80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 525 University Ave
The Hospital for Sick Children
Telepsychiatry
Toronto ON M5G 2L3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 22 Dec 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Italy

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Battaglia & Marino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Battaglia (CPSO#: 108348 ) Dr. C. Marino (CPSO#: 108347 )
Business Address: 80 Workman Way
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4

Corporation Name: Battaglia & Marino Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Jun 2023

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Dec 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 22 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Cecilia Marino may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, Division of Child and Youth Mental Health, University
of Toronto, in which Dr. Marino holds an academic appointment at
the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Marino no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Cecilia Marino may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, Division of Child and Youth Mental Health, University
of Toronto, in which Dr. Marino holds an academic appointment at
the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Marino no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Milan, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2015