THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:50:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 199 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905873.3000
Fax: 9058730800

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karan Dhir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dhir (CPSO#: 108358 )
Business Address: 199 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 0E3
905873.3000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 199 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905873.3000
Fax: 9058730800

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 18 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karan Dhir Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dhir (CPSO#: 108358 )
Business Address: 199 Princess Anne Drive
Halton Hills Ontario L7G 0E3
905873.3000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARAN DHIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHIR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARAN DHIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHIR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2015
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2015