THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:06:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tanta University, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 114
704 Mara Street
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 491-8824
Fax: (519) 479-9950

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.A.H.Abdalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abdalla (CPSO#: 108376 )
Business Address: 704 Mara St
Point Edward ON N7V 1X4
2263492503

Corporation Name: Dr. A.H. Abdalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Tanta University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 114
704 Mara Street
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 491-8824
Fax: (519) 479-9950

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 06 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.A.H.Abdalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abdalla (CPSO#: 108376 )
Business Address: 704 Mara St
Point Edward ON N7V 1X4
2263492503

Corporation Name: Dr. A.H. Abdalla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDALLA HASSAN ABDALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDALLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABDALLA HASSAN ABDALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDALLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tanta University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2016