THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:44:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1453 Prince Rd
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
Windsor ON N9C 3Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192575112
Fax: 5192575242
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 13 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Virk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Virk (CPSO#: 108399 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Essex Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4444 Extn: 33329
Business Address: 1453 Prince Road
Essex Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5112
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Essex Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1453 Prince Rd
Hotel Dieu Grace Hospital
Windsor ON N9C 3Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5192575112
Fax: 5192575242
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 13 Oct 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 13 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Virk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Virk (CPSO#: 108399 )
Business Address: 1030 Ouellette Avenue
Essex Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4444 Extn: 33329
Business Address: 1453 Prince Road
Essex Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5112
Business Address: 1995 Lens Avenue
Essex Ontario N8W 1L9
(519) 254-5577

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARMANDEEP KAUR VIRK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIRK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARMANDEEP KAUR VIRK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VIRK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2016