THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:39:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bangalore University, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Laboratory Medicine
Brampton Civic Hopspital
2100, Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 50698
Fax: 905-494-6622

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 10 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.S. Bellur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bellur (CPSO#: 108456 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 50698

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Bangalore University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Laboratory Medicine
Brampton Civic Hopspital
2100, Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 50698
Fax: 905-494-6622

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 10 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S.S. Bellur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bellur (CPSO#: 108456 )
Business Address: Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 50698

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHUBHA SATYAMURTHY BELLUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHUBHA SATYAMURTHY BELLUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELLUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bangalore University, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2016