THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 08:54:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2213 Bloor St W
Runnymede Medical Clinic
208
Toronto ON M6S 1N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 800-9697
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 157 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
Phone: 905 453 1340
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tajinder Singh Kaura Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ho-Wo-Cheong (CPSO#: 108458 ) Dr. T. Kaura (CPSO#: 104613 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wel
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(905) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2213 Bloor St W
Runnymede Medical Clinic
208
Toronto ON M6S 1N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 800-9697
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 157 Queen St E
Brampton ON L6W 3X4
Phone: 905 453 1340
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tajinder Singh Kaura Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Ho-Wo-Cheong (CPSO#: 108458 ) Dr. T. Kaura (CPSO#: 104613 )
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120
Business Address: Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wel
Brampton Ontario L6W 2Z8
(905) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMA HO-WO-CHEONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO-WO-CHEONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMA HO-WO-CHEONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HO-WO-CHEONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2016