THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:12:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 219 Queenston Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2P 2W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 685-8082
Fax: (905) 988-5776
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue St
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647
Extension: 45711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 15 Nov 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Refaei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Refaei (CPSO#: 108461 )
Business Address: 219 Queenston Street
St Catharines Ontario L2P 2W9
(905) 685-8082

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 219 Queenston Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2P 2W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 685-8082
Fax: (905) 988-5776
Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue St
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9
Phone: 905-378-4647
Extension: 45711
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 15 Nov 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 15 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Refaei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Mar 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Refaei (CPSO#: 108461 )
Business Address: 219 Queenston Street
St Catharines Ontario L2P 2W9
(905) 685-8082

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD REFAEI REFAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REFAEI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD REFAEI REFAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REFAEI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Mar 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 May 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2016