THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:19:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Benin, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ivory Medical Clinic
Suite 104
10830 Bayview Ave
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 237-5678
Fax: (905) 237-5650

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bose Ibude Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ibude (CPSO#: 108484 )
Business Address: Suite 104
10830 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1L7
(905) 237-5678

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Benin, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ivory Medical Clinic
Suite 104
10830 Bayview Ave
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1L7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 237-5678
Fax: (905) 237-5650

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bose Ibude Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ibude (CPSO#: 108484 )
Business Address: Suite 104
10830 Bayview Avenue
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 1L7
(905) 237-5678

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOSE ENOMA IBUDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBUDE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BOSE ENOMA IBUDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IBUDE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Dec 2020
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Feb 2020
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Dec 2020
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 11 Feb 2020
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:

Training

Medical School: University of Benin, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 May 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 May 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2016