THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:58:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SINDHI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 35-1495 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-339-3211
Fax: 905-339-3246

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Lal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lal (CPSO#: 108494 )
Business Address: 35-1495 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 0B2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, SINDHI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 35-1495 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-339-3211
Fax: 905-339-3246

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 12 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 12 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Lal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Aug 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lal (CPSO#: 108494 )
Business Address: 35-1495 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON L6J 0B2

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
03 Feb 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 03 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Kartar Lal may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Kartar Lal may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2016