THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:43:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Steeles Ave West
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-807-0596
Fax: 289-807-0597
Address: 50 McIntosh Drive
Markham Ontario L3R 9T3
Phone: 2898070596
Fax: 2898070597
Address: Appletree Medical Centre
4700 Keele St
North York Ontario M3J 1P3
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: 647-490-6330
Address: University Health Centre
4801 Keele St
North York Ontario M3J 3A4
Phone: (416) 398-7523
Fax: (416) 398-7524
Address: C1-95 Times Ave
Medione Physicians Times
Thornhill ON L3T 0A2
Phone: 9057070666
Fax: 2898070597
Address: 9200 Bathurst
Phone: 2898070596
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jan 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ricardo Ko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ko (CPSO#: 108495 )
Business Address: 100 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill ON L4J 7Y1
289-807-0596

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Steeles Ave West
Thornhill Ontario L4J 7Y1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-807-0596
Fax: 289-807-0597
Address: 50 McIntosh Drive
Markham Ontario L3R 9T3
Phone: 2898070596
Fax: 2898070597
Address: Appletree Medical Centre
4700 Keele St
North York Ontario M3J 1P3
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: 647-490-6330
Address: University Health Centre
4801 Keele St
North York Ontario M3J 3A4
Phone: (416) 398-7523
Fax: (416) 398-7524
Address: C1-95 Times Ave
Medione Physicians Times
Thornhill ON L3T 0A2
Phone: 9057070666
Fax: 2898070597
Address: 9200 Bathurst
Phone: 2898070596
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 13 Jan 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 13 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ricardo Ko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ko (CPSO#: 108495 )
Business Address: 100 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill ON L4J 7Y1
289-807-0596

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICARDO L. KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RICARDO L. KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2016