THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:26:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Concession Road
Suite 224
Cambridge Ontario N3H 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-624-8977
Fax: 519-653-2773

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HT MacKenzie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. H. MacKenzie (CPSO#: 108511 )
Business Address: S233-1145 Concession Rd
Cambridge ON N3H 4L5
5196248977

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1145 Concession Road
Suite 224
Cambridge Ontario N3H 4L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-624-8977
Fax: 519-653-2773

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 24 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HT MacKenzie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. H. MacKenzie (CPSO#: 108511 )
Business Address: S233-1145 Concession Rd
Cambridge ON N3H 4L5
5196248977

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER THERESA MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER THERESA MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Apr 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2016