THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:17:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
General Campus
Division of Internal Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Toronto Metabolic Clinic
2175 Sheppard Avenue East,Suite 304
North York Ontario M2J1W8
Phone: 6473414517
Fax: 6474976006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Hartmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Mar 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Health Network
General Campus
Division of Internal Medicine
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Toronto Metabolic Clinic
2175 Sheppard Avenue East,Suite 304
North York Ontario M2J1W8
Phone: 6473414517
Fax: 6474976006

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicholas Hartmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Mar 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS HARTMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARTMANN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS HARTMANN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARTMANN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Feb 2016