THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:04:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St Petersburg State Pediatric Medical AC, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, RUSSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 819 5920352
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Hospital (Cornwall) Cornwall
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Hospital (Cornwall)
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MARTIAL YITEMBEN TCHOUATIEU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yitemben Tchouatieu (CPSO#: 108523 )

Corporation Name: Martial Yitemben Tchouatieu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, RUSSIAN
Medical School: St Petersburg State Pediatric Medical AC, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Cornwall Community Hospital
840 McConnell Avenue
Cornwall Ontario K6H 5S5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 819 5920352
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Hospital (Cornwall) Cornwall
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Hospital (Cornwall)
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MARTIAL YITEMBEN TCHOUATIEU MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yitemben Tchouatieu (CPSO#: 108523 )

Corporation Name: Martial Yitemben Tchouatieu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIAL YITEMBEN TCHOUATIEU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YITEMBEN TCHOUATIEU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARTIAL YITEMBEN TCHOUATIEU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YITEMBEN TCHOUATIEU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St Petersburg State Pediatric Medical AC, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2016
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2016