THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:03:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Lebanese University, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 108-359 Riverside Dr
Sudbury ON P3E 1H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 805 6544
Fax: 705 805 6541

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 12 Jan 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Lebanon

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roula Toubassy Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Toubassy (CPSO#: 108547 )
Business Address: 7058056544
Business Address: 359 Riverside Drive
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 1H5
7058056544

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Lebanese University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 108-359 Riverside Dr
Sudbury ON P3E 1H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 805 6544
Fax: 705 805 6541

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 12 Jan 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Lebanon

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Roula Toubassy Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Toubassy (CPSO#: 108547 )
Business Address: 7058056544
Business Address: 359 Riverside Drive
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 1H5
7058056544

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROULA TOUBASSY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOUBASSY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROULA TOUBASSY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOUBASSY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Lebanese University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016