THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:17:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1999
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IGBO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-1956 Robertson Rd
Nepean ON K2H 5B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135181853
Fax: 6139121808

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Chukwu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chukwu (CPSO#: 108552 )
Business Address: 104-1956 Robertson Rd
Nepean ON K2H 5B9
6139814440
Business Address: Health Treatment Medical Centre
16 Green Street
Ottawa Ontario K2J 3Z6
(613) 825-9799

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IGBO
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 104-1956 Robertson Rd
Nepean ON K2H 5B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6135181853
Fax: 6139121808

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 May 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 09 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Chukwu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chukwu (CPSO#: 108552 )
Business Address: 104-1956 Robertson Rd
Nepean ON K2H 5B9
6139814440
Business Address: Health Treatment Medical Centre
16 Green Street
Ottawa Ontario K2J 3Z6
(613) 825-9799

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL KELECHUKWU CHUKWU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUKWU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL KELECHUKWU CHUKWU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUKWU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2016