THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:03:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1997
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital
Department of Pathology and
Molecular Medicine
711 Concession St
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 42063
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 22 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HAMID KAZEROUNI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kazerouni (CPSO#: 108603 )
Business Address: 8-509 Elizabeth St
Burlington ON L7R 2M4
4165500871

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital
Department of Pathology and
Molecular Medicine
711 Concession St
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 42063
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 22 May 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: HAMID KAZEROUNI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kazerouni (CPSO#: 108603 )
Business Address: 8-509 Elizabeth St
Burlington ON L7R 2M4
4165500871

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Jul 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 29 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ABDUL HAMID KAZEROUNI may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. ABDUL HAMID KAZEROUNI may practise medicine independently in anatomical pathology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jul 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Jan 2022
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2022

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2016