THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:30:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, Barbados, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8237
Fax: 519-685-8584
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Cardiology
Effective: 27 Mar 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Oct 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 27 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Barbados

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marisha McClean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McClean (CPSO#: 108612 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
5196858500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, Barbados, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-685-8237
Fax: 519-685-8584
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8W 1L9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Cardiology
Effective: 27 Mar 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Oct 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 27 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Barbados

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marisha McClean Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. McClean (CPSO#: 108612 )
Business Address: Children's Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
5196858500

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Mar 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 27 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MARISHA NIKIWE MCCLEAN may practise medicine independently in pediatrics and pediatric cardiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MARISHA NIKIWE MCCLEAN may practise medicine independently in pediatrics and pediatric cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, Barbados, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Mar 2025
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Apr 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2016