THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:55:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 475 Bond Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054476528
Fax: 9052256528
Address: 300 Rossland Road East
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0K4
Phone: 9054477528
Fax: 9052256528
Address: 222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Phone: 9054476528
Fax: 9052256528

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 24 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maroosh Mumtaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mumtaz (CPSO#: 108620 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 475 Bond Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054476528
Fax: 9052256528
Address: 300 Rossland Road East
Ajax Ontario L1Z 0K4
Phone: 9054477528
Fax: 9052256528
Address: 222 King Street East
Bowmanville Ontario L1C 1P6
Phone: 9054476528
Fax: 9052256528

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 24 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maroosh Mumtaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mumtaz (CPSO#: 108620 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAROOSH MUMTAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUMTAZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAROOSH MUMTAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUMTAZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Edward Medical University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2016