THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:07:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Trafalgar Rd
Oakville ON L6H 7H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-837-4463
Fax: 905-582-2835
Address: 2035 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 0A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parminder Kaur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kaur (CPSO#: 108625 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2200 Trafalgar Rd
Oakville ON L6H 7H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-837-4463
Fax: 905-582-2835
Address: 2035 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 0A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parminder Kaur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Oct 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kaur (CPSO#: 108625 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARMINDER KAUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARMINDER KAUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAUR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Windsor University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Feb 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 May 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 May 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2016