THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:24:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Hamburg University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN - Interdepartmental Division
of Critical Care
PMB 11-121, 585 University Ave.
Toronto ON. M5G 2N2
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Dragoi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Dragoi (CPSO#: 108650 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Interdepartmental Division of Critical Care
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Hamburg University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN - Interdepartmental Division
of Critical Care
PMB 11-121, 585 University Ave.
Toronto ON. M5G 2N2
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 May 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laura Dragoi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Dragoi (CPSO#: 108650 )
Business Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Interdepartmental Division of Critical Care
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
(416) 340-4800

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 May 2024
30 Apr 2031
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Apr 30 2031
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. LAURA DRAGOI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Critical Care, University of Toronto, in which Dr. DRAGOI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DRAGOI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DRAGOI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DRAGOI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 May, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 April, 2031.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. LAURA DRAGOI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Critical Care, University of Toronto, in which Dr. DRAGOI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. DRAGOI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. DRAGOI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. DRAGOI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 May, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 30 April, 2031.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Hamburg University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 May 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Apr 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Mar 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Dec 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Jan 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2016
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 May 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Feb 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Mar 2016